NY S06440 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1027
2012-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 6440A
2012-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2012-02-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A09274 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.462

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback