NY A09274 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.462
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.771
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6447B
2012-06-14SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblyrepassed assembly
2012-06-11Assemblyamended on third reading 9274b
2012-06-11Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2012-06-11Senaterecalled from senate
2012-05-21SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2012-05-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-05-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.594
2012-05-15Assemblyreported
2012-05-02Assemblyprint number 9274a
2012-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2012-05-01Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-02-13Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06440 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06447 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9274B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09274&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09274&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09274
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09274&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09274A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09274&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09274B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09274&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A9274#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback