NY S06437 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires police agencies to take reports of missing adults whenever the adult is reported to be missing.
Title
Requires police agencies to take reports of missing adults whenever the adult is reported to be missing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.316 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9957 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1395 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6437A |
2016-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09957 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6437a