NY S06424 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the amount of time the city of Middletown is authorized to sell or pledge delinquent liens held by such city.
Title
Extends the amount of time the city of Middletown is authorized to sell or pledge delinquent liens held by such city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.38 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.554 |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | substituted for a9208 |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2016-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-02-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6424A |
2016-01-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-01-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.35 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09208 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - substituted by s6424a