NY S06411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.628
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.628
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to financing project costs for the project for the Battery Park project area.
Title
Relates to financing project costs for the project for the Battery Park project area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.628 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1629 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6411A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.428 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.428 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8122 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1629 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6411A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08122 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.628