NY S06352 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposition of pari-mutuel pools of an amount equal to five and ninety-four hundredths percent of the total pools resulting from on-track regular bets of the franchised corporation.
Title
Relates to the disposition of pari-mutuel pools of an amount equal to five and ninety-four hundredths percent of the total pools resulting from on-track regular bets of the franchised corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.367 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.234 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7306 |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.858 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A07306 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6352