NY S06341 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.453
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.453
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the SLA to issue company permits for certain vehicles over sixty-five thousand pounds.
Title
Authorizes the SLA to issue company permits for certain vehicles over sixty-five thousand pounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.453 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9643a |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6341B |
2012-05-15 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.700 |
2012-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6341A |
2012-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09643 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6341b