NY S06282 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes community composting operations registered with the department of environmental conservation but not requiring a permit from such department to use parklands without violating alienation laws or restrictions.
Title
Authorizes community composting operations registered with the department of environmental conservation but not requiring a permit from such department to use parklands without violating alienation laws or restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1040 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6282C |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6282B |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6282A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07774 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to environmental conservation