NY S06266 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Cornwall, county of Orange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Cornwall, county of Orange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-25AssemblySIGNED CHAP.154
2017-07-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.509
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7840a
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1764
2017-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 6266A
2017-06-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07840 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6266a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback