NY A07840 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6266a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Cornwall, county of Orange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Cornwall, county of Orange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6266a
2017-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.509
2017-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.509
2017-06-19Assemblyreported
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-06-01Assemblyprint number 7840a
2017-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2017-05-16Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06266 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.154

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07840
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07840A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07840&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback