NY S06248 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligible years for payment in lieu of taxes for certain agreements.
Title
Relates to eligible years for payment in lieu of taxes for certain agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.145 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.723 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | substituted for a9390 |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.11 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09390 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - substituted by s6248