NY S06221 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of New City, town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland, as the "Rockland County Clerk Paul Piperato Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of New City, town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland, as the "Rockland County Clerk Paul Piperato Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.411 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.768 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7221 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1243 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07221 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6221