NY A07221 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of New City, town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland, as the "Rockland County Clerk Paul Piperato Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of New City, town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland, as the "Rockland County Clerk Paul Piperato Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6221 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.768 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06221 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.411