NY S06200 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for family members of a crime victim and interested parties to make statements to members of the parole board; provides that such oral statement shall be made to the members of the state board of parole who will determine whether the defendant is released.
Title
Provides for family members of a crime victim and interested parties to make statements to members of the parole board; provides that such oral statement shall be made to the members of the state board of parole who will determine whether the defendant is released.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.875 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6200A |
2018-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1318 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08444 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - print number 8444a