NY A08444 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 8444a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 8444a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for family members of a crime victim and interested parties to make statements to members of the parole board; provides that such oral statement shall be made to the members of the state board of parole who will determine whether the defendant is released.
Title
Provides for family members of a crime victim and interested parties to make statements to members of the parole board; provides that such oral statement shall be made to the members of the state board of parole who will determine whether the defendant is released.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Assembly | print number 8444a |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06200 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - referred to codes