NY S06175 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Title
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.301 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1072 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07520 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary