NY S06173 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sex offenders from being bus drivers.
Title
Prohibits sex offenders from being bus drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.955 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1663 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08495 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation