NY S06172 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disabling, removal or interference with emission control devices and the use of emission tampering devices; provides remedies for the violation of such provisions.
Title
Prohibits the disabling, removal or interference with emission control devices and the use of emission tampering devices; provides remedies for the violation of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.734 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6172A |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.981 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10351 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - referred to environmental conservation