NY S06162 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the special powers of the New York state environmental facilities corporation; moneys in certain funds may be utilized to fulfill obligations of governmental entities of another state that are backed by the full faith and credit of that state and rated in one of the two highest rating categories by at least one nationally recognized rating organization.
Title
Relates to the special powers of the New York state environmental facilities corporation; moneys in certain funds may be utilized to fulfill obligations of governmental entities of another state that are backed by the full faith and credit of that state and rated in one of the two highest rating categories by at least one nationally recognized rating organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.511 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1224 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |