NY S06075 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state board of parole to require a felony sex offender to serve his or her maximum term, if, by convincing evidence, release would pose an imminent threat to society; authorizes the withholding of good behavior allowances of felony sex offenders by the state board of parole upon such a finding.
Title
Authorizes the state board of parole to require a felony sex offender to serve his or her maximum term, if, by convincing evidence, release would pose an imminent threat to society; authorizes the withholding of good behavior allowances of felony sex offenders by the state board of parole upon such a finding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-14 | Senate | AMENDED 6075A |
2012-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.711 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |