NY S06003 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retailers of electronic cigarettes, not otherwise registered with the department of taxation and finance to sell tobacco products, to register with the department of health.
Title
Requires retailers of electronic cigarettes, not otherwise registered with the department of taxation and finance to sell tobacco products, to register with the department of health.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.275 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a852 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.182 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1879 |
2015-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00852 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6003