NY S05981 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits all registered organizations, licensees, or permittees or other entities under the jurisdiction of the cannabis board from selling or delivering any edible cannabis products not in child resistant packaging.
Title
Prohibits all registered organizations, licensees, or permittees or other entities under the jurisdiction of the cannabis board from selling or delivering any edible cannabis products not in child resistant packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.707 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06666 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development