NY S05959 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain policies issued by a risk retention group not chartered in this state but which is registered with the superintendent of financial services under the federal liability risk retention act of 1986, comprised entirely of organizations to which contributions are eligible for deduction under section 501(c)(3) of the internal revenue code and which qualifies as a charitable risk pool under section 501(n) of the internal revenue code.
Title
Authorizes certain policies issued by a risk retention group not chartered in this state but which is registered with the superintendent of financial services under the federal liability risk retention act of 1986, comprised entirely of organizations to which contributions are eligible for deduction under section 501(c)(3) of the internal revenue code and which qualifies as a charitable risk pool under section 501(n) of the internal revenue code.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.8 |
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.438 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.704 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a5718b |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5959B |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1188 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5959A |
2023-04-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2023-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05718 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s5959b