NY S05953 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.576
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.576
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland to discontinue certain park lands; authorizes such town to convey such lands to the county of Rockland for the purpose of such county completing roadway safety improvements, including the replacement of a structurally deficient bridge and channel realignment in order to reduce flooding in such area.
Title
Authorizes the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland to discontinue certain park lands; authorizes such town to convey such lands to the county of Rockland for the purpose of such county completing roadway safety improvements, including the replacement of a structurally deficient bridge and channel realignment in order to reduce flooding in such area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.576 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.799 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6745a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5953A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.951 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06745 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5953a