NY S05951 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7902A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7902A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain actions of the Candor fire district and the village of Candor relating to their provision of fire protection services within the territorial boundaries of the village of Candor, and authorizes the creation of a joint fire district.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain actions of the Candor fire district and the village of Candor relating to their provision of fire protection services within the territorial boundaries of the village of Candor, and authorizes the creation of a joint fire district.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7902A |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1904 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5951A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07902 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - signed chap.421