NY S05943 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory health insurance coverage for prosthetic devices; requires coverage where the model is determined to be medically necessary for rehabilitative and habilitative purposes.
Title
Requires mandatory health insurance coverage for prosthetic devices; requires coverage where the model is determined to be medically necessary for rehabilitative and habilitative purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1446 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5943A |
2016-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1758 |
2015-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |