NY S05923 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6617A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6617A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children from money judgments; provides that in services of notices, forms, and procedures for claims of exemptions that a restraining notice or notice of levy by execution issued against a bank account shall have language to inform the holder of such account that funds for COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children are exempt and cannot be taken.
Title
Exempts COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children from money judgments; provides that in services of notices, forms, and procedures for claims of exemptions that a restraining notice or notice of levy by execution issued against a bank account shall have language to inform the holder of such account that funds for COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children are exempt and cannot be taken.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6617A |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5923A |
2021-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06617 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - signed chap.107