NY A06617 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - signed chap.107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children from money judgments; provides that in services of notices, forms, and procedures for claims of exemptions that a restraining notice or notice of levy by execution issued against a bank account shall have language to inform the holder of such account that funds for COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children are exempt and cannot be taken.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children from money judgments; provides that in services of notices, forms, and procedures for claims of exemptions that a restraining notice or notice of levy by execution issued against a bank account shall have language to inform the holder of such account that funds for COVID-19 stimulus relief for individuals and families with children are exempt and cannot be taken.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13Senatesigned chap.107
2021-05-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-04-28SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-04-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-04-28Senate3RD READING CAL.695
2021-04-28SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5923A
2021-04-19SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2021-04-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-04-19Assemblypassed assembly
2021-03-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.48
2021-03-30Assemblyrules report cal.48
2021-03-30Assemblyreported
2021-03-30Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-03-27Assemblyprint number 6617a
2021-03-27Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-03-22Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05923 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6617A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A6617
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06617&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06617
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06617&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06617A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06617&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06617&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06617&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A6617#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback