NY S05891 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that enhanced tuition awards are for attendance at private degree granting institutions of higher education.
Title
Clarifies that enhanced tuition awards are for attendance at private degree granting institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7697 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1900 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07697 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - tabled