NY S05870 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the health care professional transparency act; prohibits health care professionals from using deceptive or misleading advertising.
Title
Enacts the health care professional transparency act; prohibits health care professionals from using deceptive or misleading advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5870A |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1114 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1244 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00560 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education