NY S05867 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5867A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5867A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of a student with a disability.
Title
Amends the definition of a student with a disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5867A |
2018-04-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07639 (Same As) 2018-04-20 - print number 7639a