NY A07639 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - print number 7639a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of a student with a disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the definition of a student with a disability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20Assemblyprint number 7639a
2018-04-20Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to education
2017-05-05Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05867 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5867A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback