PA HB1633 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Act No. 74 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting the enforcement of certain noncompete covenants entered into by health care practitioners and employers and providing for a study by the Health Care Cost Containment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the enforcement of certain noncompete covenants entered into by health care practitioners and employers and providing for a study by the Health Care Cost Containment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1633 PN 3504, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 3504, CONCURRENCE (Y: 155 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05412 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2959, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 150 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2959, CONSTITUTIONALITY (Y: 136 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2817, 2023 A3913 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2817, 2023 A3902 (Y: 124 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03789 (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03814 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03756 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-17HouseAct No. 74 of 2024
2024-07-17HouseApproved by the Governor
2024-07-12HousePresented to the Governor
2024-07-11HouseSigned in Senate
2024-07-11HouseSigned in House
2024-07-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (155-46)
2024-07-11HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2024-07-11HouseReferred to RULES
2024-07-11HouseIn the House
2024-07-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2024-07-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-07-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-07-10SenateAmended on third consideration
2024-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2024-07-03SenateFirst consideration
2024-07-03SenateReported as amended
2024-05-01SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2024-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2024-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (150-50)
2024-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-04-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2024-04-15HouseRemoved from table
2024-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2024-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2024-03-27HouseReported as amended
2023-09-06HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1960
2023-08-29HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=1917
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=1960
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=2817
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=2959
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=3486
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1633&pn=3504
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=1960&aYear=2023&an=03814
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=1960&aYear=2023&an=03789
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=1960&aYear=2023&an=03756
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=2817&aYear=2023&an=03913
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=2817&aYear=2023&an=03902
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=2959&aYear=2023&an=05412
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1633&pn=3486&aYear=2023&an=05519
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1633P2959.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB1633P3486.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1633P3504.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1488
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1486
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1487
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1485
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1034
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1035
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1048
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1049
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=04/17/2024&RollCallId=1605
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=07/03/2024&RollCallId=1200
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=07/03/2024&RollCallId=1199
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/11/2024&RollCallId=1228
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1466
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=624
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=07/11/2024&RollCallId=2329

Bill Comments

feedback