NY S05863 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost for legal services in connection with any claim arising under the volunteer firefighter's benefit law.
Title
Relates to the cost for legal services in connection with any claim arising under the volunteer firefighter's benefit law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR |
2023-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07089 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to local governments