NY S05857 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5857B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5857B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right of privacy and the right of publicity for both living and deceased individuals; provides that an individual's persona is the personal property of the individual and is freely transferable and descendible; provides for the registration with the department of state of such rights of a deceased individual; and that the use of a digital replica for purposes of trade within an expressive work shall be a violation.
Title
Establishes the right of privacy and the right of publicity for both living and deceased individuals; provides that an individual's persona is the personal property of the individual and is freely transferable and descendible; provides for the registration with the department of state of such rights of a deceased individual; and that the use of a digital replica for purposes of trade within an expressive work shall be a violation.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5857B |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5857A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1131 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08155 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES