NY S05814 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5814A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5814A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to patient self-determination at end of life; authorizes a physician with a bona fide physician-patient relationship with a patient with a terminal illness or condition to prescribe a lethal dose of the medication to be self-administered; defines terminal illness or condition to be an illness or condition which can reasonably be expected to cause death within six months, whether or not treatment is provided; provides immunity to health care providers.
Title
Relates to patient self-determination at end of life; authorizes a physician with a bona fide physician-patient relationship with a patient with a terminal illness or condition to prescribe a lethal dose of the medication to be self-administered; defines terminal illness or condition to be an illness or condition which can reasonably be expected to cause death within six months, whether or not treatment is provided; provides immunity to health care providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5814A |
2016-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05261 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - print number 5261c