NY A05261 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5261c
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5261c
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the patient self-determination act; authorizes a physician with a bona fide physician-patient relationship with a patient with a terminal illness or condition to prescribe a lethal dose of the medication to be self-administered; defines terminal illness or condition to be an illness or condition which can reasonably be expected to cause death within six months, whether or not treatment is provided; provides immunity to health care providers.
Title
Relates to the patient self-determination act; authorizes a physician with a bona fide physician-patient relationship with a patient with a terminal illness or condition to prescribe a lethal dose of the medication to be self-administered; defines terminal illness or condition to be an illness or condition which can reasonably be expected to cause death within six months, whether or not treatment is provided; provides immunity to health care providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5261c |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | print number 5261b |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | print number 5261a |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05814 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5814A