NY S05793 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study the creation of a quantum computing project to make recommendations on how to utilize quantum computing for the purposes of developing computers for civilian, business, trade, environmental and security purposes, such as cryptanalysis, in this state.
Title
Establishes a task force to study the creation of a quantum computing project to make recommendations on how to utilize quantum computing for the purposes of developing computers for civilian, business, trade, environmental and security purposes, such as cryptanalysis, in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1157 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A03812 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations