NY S05785 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Jonathan Roman, David Arroyo, and Vincent Fiumara to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law; authorizes Jason Behar to receive certain service credit under section 384 of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Jonathan Roman, David Arroyo, and Vincent Fiumara to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law; authorizes Jason Behar to receive certain service credit under section 384 of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1197 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07987 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - enacting clause stricken