NY S05774 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5774A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5774A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Lansing, county of Tompkins to conduct a special election on September 9, 2014 for the purpose of conducting a referendum for a town-wide sewer benefit district.
Title
Authorizes the town of Lansing, county of Tompkins to conduct a special election on September 9, 2014 for the purpose of conducting a referendum for a town-wide sewer benefit district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5774A |
2014-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1467 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08015 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to local governments