NY S05752 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Title
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.168 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a2597 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1072 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02597 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5752