NY A02597 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Title
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s5752 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.282 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05752 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.168