NY S05745 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage sharks; extends provisions until December 31, 2020.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage sharks; extends provisions until December 31, 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8277 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1960 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08277 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.223