NY S05668 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false, fraudulent or not the presenter's; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Title
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false, fraudulent or not the presenter's; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.95 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1617 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A04004 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development