NY A04004 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false, fraudulent or not the presenter's; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Title
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false, fraudulent or not the presenter's; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | print number 4004a |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05668 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - referred to economic development