NY S05652 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the Town of Niagara industrial development agency.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the Town of Niagara industrial development agency.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.435 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.879 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5930b |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1643 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5652B |
2023-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5652A |
2023-05-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05930 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - substituted by s5652b