NY S05643 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of transportation and the New York state emergency medical services council, to promulgate rules and regulations for the operation of ambulances.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of transportation and the New York state emergency medical services council, to promulgate rules and regulations for the operation of ambulances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5643A |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.371 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.904 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07505 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - print number 7505a