NY S05639 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New York 811, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes New York 811, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.513 |
2013-11-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.484 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7926 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1401 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07926 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - substituted by s5639