NY S05636 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licenses to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises in the city of Binghamton.
Title
Relates to licenses to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises in the city of Binghamton.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7391 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.818 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07391 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - signed chap.47