NY S05634 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7193C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7193C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employer's duties regarding optional public retirement systems; provides for the automatic enrollment for employees whose right to membership has been made optional by the head of the public retirement system involved.
Title
Relates to employer's duties regarding optional public retirement systems; provides for the automatic enrollment for employees whose right to membership has been made optional by the head of the public retirement system involved.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] |
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7193C |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1338 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5634B |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5634A |
2017-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07193 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - tabled